NY A11118 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.261
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows water works corporations to provide water usage data to municipalities.
Title
Allows water works corporations to provide water usage data to municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.261 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2133 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8999B |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.302 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.302 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 11118c |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | print number 11118b |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | print number 11118a |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08999 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11118C