NY A11121 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the commissioner of DMV to require examination of a person involved in an accident caused by a loss of consciousness or awareness; directs DMV, in consultation with the New York state department of health and the New York state division of state police, to undertake a review of the department's medical review program regarding the department's reexamination of drivers who may suffer from a chronic, ongoing condition that may cause loss of consciousness, loss of awareness or loss of body control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the commissioner of DMV to require examination of a person involved in an accident caused by a loss of consciousness or awareness; directs DMV, in consultation with the New York state department of health and the New York state division of state police, to undertake a review of the department's medical review program regarding the department's reexamination of drivers who may suffer from a chronic, ongoing condition that may cause loss of consciousness, loss of awareness or loss of body control.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.346
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1986
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8990
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.289
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.289
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-06-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-06-06Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S08990 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11121

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A11121
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A11121#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11121&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback