NY A11137 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8940
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8940
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to Spectrum Designs Foundation Ltd. for portions of the 2016-2017 school and general taxes and all of the 2017-2018 school and 2018 general taxes.
Title
Relates to permitting a retroactive property tax exemption to Spectrum Designs Foundation Ltd. for portions of the 2016-2017 school and general taxes and all of the 2017-2018 school and 2018 general taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8940 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.396 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.396 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08940 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.452