NY A11167 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8345a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8345a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Orangetown, county of Rockland, to discontinue the use of municipally owned park land, and dedicate certain other lands as park lands.
Title
Authorizes the town of Orangetown, county of Rockland, to discontinue the use of municipally owned park land, and dedicate certain other lands as park lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8345a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.431 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.431 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08345 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.503