NY A11171 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s8693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes and directs the commissioner of environmental conservation to conduct a study on food waste initiatives and to provide recommendations based on the study's findings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes and directs the commissioner of environmental conservation to conduct a study on food waste initiatives and to provide recommendations based on the study's findings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s8693
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.266
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.266
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S08693 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.325

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback