NY A11183 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Clayton, county of Jefferson to transfer and convey certain parklands to Dean Hyde in exchange for certain lands owned by Dean Hyde which shall be used as parkland and as part of the village of Clayton's riverwalk project.
Title
Authorizes the village of Clayton, county of Jefferson to transfer and convey certain parklands to Dean Hyde in exchange for certain lands owned by Dean Hyde which shall be used as parkland and as part of the village of Clayton's riverwalk project.
Sponsors
Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s8536 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.435 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.435 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08536 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.506