NY A11217 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing and extending the authority of the Nassau county interim finance authority to issue bonds and notes.
Title
Relates to increasing and extending the authority of the Nassau county interim finance authority to issue bonds and notes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.306 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.306 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08964 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - REFERRED TO RULES