NY A11227 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.263
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Implements an agreement between the state and an employee organization which provides for the adjustment of salaries of certain incumbents in the professional service in the state university; provides for the adjustment of salaries of certain employees of the state university of New York who are excluded from collective bargaining and certain employees of the contract colleges of Cornell and Alfred universities; makes an appropriation for the purpose of effectuating certain provisions thereof.
Title
Implements an agreement between the state and an employee organization which provides for the adjustment of salaries of certain incumbents in the professional service in the state university; provides for the adjustment of salaries of certain employees of the state university of New York who are excluded from collective bargaining and certain employees of the contract colleges of Cornell and Alfred universities; makes an appropriation for the purpose of effectuating certain provisions thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.263 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2087 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.437 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.437 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S09101 (Same As) 2018-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES