NY A11241 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to civil service provisional employees in New York city; extends certain provisions relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to civil service provisional employees in New York city; extends certain provisions relating thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.419
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1976
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8837A
2018-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.399
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.399
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-16Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S08837 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11241

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11241&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11241&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A11241
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11241&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11241&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A11241#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11241&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback