NY A11319 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s8017
Status: Introduced on June 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s8017
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide for a technical clarification regarding the approval and issuance proc- ess for charters.
Title
Enacts a chapter amendment relating to charter schools in relation to unissued charters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | substituted by s8017 | |
2010-07-01 | rules report cal.578 | |
2010-07-01 | reported | |
2010-06-09 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-02 | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08017 (Same As) 2010-07-15 - SIGNED CHAP.221
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A11319&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |