NY J00313 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-22)
Status: Passed on January 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-22)
Status: Passed on January 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 100th Anniversary of the Declaration of Ireland's Independence on January 21, 2019
Title
Commemorating the 100th Anniversary of the Declaration of Ireland's Independence on January 21, 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | ADOPTED |
2019-01-29 | Senate | REPORTED TO CALENDAR FOR CONSIDERATION |
2019-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
K00054 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - adopted