NY K00376 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Memorializing Governor Andrew M. Cuomo to proclaim May 13, 2019, as Blue Star Families' Day in the State of New York
Title
Memorializing Governor Andrew M. Cuomo to proclaim May 13, 2019, as Blue Star Families' Day in the State of New York
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Assembly | adopted |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | referred to calendar |
Same As/Similar To
J01377 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - ADOPTED