NY S00011 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to giving and/or receiving unlawful benefits.
Title
Relates to giving and/or receiving unlawful benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-03-19 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 11A |
2017-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04006 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes