NY S00013 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7849A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7849A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a real property tax exemption for Kehillas B'nai HaYeshivos.
Title
Relates to a real property tax exemption for Kehillas B'nai HaYeshivos.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7849A |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1698 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 13B |
2017-06-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 13A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07849 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.225