NY S00015 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of housing and community renewal to calculate the period of rent reduction due to diminution of services from the date of actual diminution of the services.
Title
Requires the division of housing and community renewal to calculate the period of rent reduction due to diminution of services from the date of actual diminution of the services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.842 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08164 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to housing