NY S00025 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a mortgagor to receive an assignment of mortgage in lieu of a discharge of mortgage when the mortgagor is refinancing an existing loan.
Title
Allows a mortgagor to receive an assignment of mortgage in lieu of a discharge of mortgage when the mortgagor is refinancing an existing loan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1337 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |