NY S00025 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "bird-friendly building council act" to establish a council to promote the use of bird-friendly building materials and design features in buildings; research the magnitude of problems facing birds colliding with buildings; identify existing and emerging products, technologies and concepts to reduce or eliminate bird mortality from building collisions; and develop public awareness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "bird-friendly building council act" to establish a council to promote the use of bird-friendly building materials and design features in buildings; research the magnitude of problems facing birds colliding with buildings; identify existing and emerging products, technologies and concepts to reduce or eliminate bird mortality from building collisions; and develop public awareness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.256
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a4055b
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 25B
2019-06-05SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-05Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-05AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-04-30Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-04-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-08SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 25A
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.307
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A04055 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s25b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00025&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00025&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00025
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00025&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00025A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00025&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00025B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S25#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S25#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S25#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00025&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback