NY S00027 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Officer Randolf Holder's law"; relates to the judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders.
Title
Enacts "Officer Randolf Holder's law"; relates to the judicial diversion program for certain felony offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.246 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.84 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A03404 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes