NY S00031 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE
Pending: Senate Budget and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain personal protective clothing and equipment from the tax on sales and the compensating use tax.
Title
Exempts certain personal protective clothing and equipment from the tax on sales and the compensating use tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-11-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 31B |
2021-11-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-10-20 | Senate | AMEND BY RESTORING TO ORIGINAL PRINT 31 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 31A |
2021-04-22 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A05883 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means