NY S00033 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to BOCES intermediate districts.
Title
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to BOCES intermediate districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1030 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 33A |
2016-02-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1338 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03547 (Same As) 2016-05-06 - print number 3547a