NY S00035 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of imitation weapons.
Title
Clarifies the definition of imitation weapons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.189 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-03-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.115 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07355 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to consumer affairs and protection