NY S00045 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to discharged LGBT veterans; defines "LGBT veteran" and "qualifying condition"; adds veterans who have qualifying conditions or who are discharged as an LGBT veteran to certain provisions that apply to veterans who have been honorably discharged or released from military service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to discharged LGBT veterans; defines "LGBT veteran" and "qualifying condition"; adds veterans who have qualifying conditions or who are discharged as an LGBT veteran to certain provisions that apply to veterans who have been honorably discharged or released from military service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.305
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a8097
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-05SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 45B
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1020
2019-05-20SenatePRINT NUMBER 45A
2019-05-20SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A00054 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - print number 54b
A08097 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s45b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00045&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00045&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00045
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00045&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00045A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00045&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00045B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S45#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S45#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00045&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback