NY S00055 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state liquor authority to make available to the public information pertaining to any conditions it imposes on a licensed premises.
Title
Requires the state liquor authority to make available to the public information pertaining to any conditions it imposes on a licensed premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.340 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.406 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a4315 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-03-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.267 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04315 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.340