NY S00089 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a residential parking system in certain parts of the hamlet of Oceanside in the town of Hempstead near South Nassau Communities Hospital.
Title
Authorizes a residential parking system in certain parts of the hamlet of Oceanside in the town of Hempstead near South Nassau Communities Hospital.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.348 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 89A |
2019-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.147 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05266 (Same As) 2020-07-09 - print number 5266b