NY S00093 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Sets forth the means of the disposition of campaign funds upon the conviction of a felony of a candidate, former candidate or holder of elective office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sets forth the means of the disposition of campaign funds upon the conviction of a felony of a candidate, former candidate or holder of elective office.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.612
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A03645 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - referred to election law

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback