NY S00097 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE
Pending: Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE
Pending: Senate Ethics and Internal Governance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits elected officials and persons in a leadership position of a party committee from receiving compensation for legal fees, consulting, or other work performed for an industrial development agency or an economic assistance corporation.
Title
Prohibits elected officials and persons in a leadership position of a party committee from receiving compensation for legal fees, consulting, or other work performed for an industrial development agency or an economic assistance corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Ethics And Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Ethics And Internal Governance Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 97B |
2019-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.634 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 97A |
2019-05-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2019-02-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03018 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations