NY S00102 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - PRINT NUMBER 102A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-14 - PRINT NUMBER 102A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to defining immigration status; provides a civil remedy for any harm or damage to the property or person of another or for summoning a police officer without reason to suspect a crime has been or is about to be committed due to a belief or perception regarding such person's immigration status.
Title
Relates to defining immigration status; provides a civil remedy for any harm or damage to the property or person of another or for summoning a police officer without reason to suspect a crime has been or is about to be committed due to a belief or perception regarding such person's immigration status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 102A |
2022-04-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09136 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - referred to governmental operations