NY S00104 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.548
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau and the sale of such parkland for fair market value.
Title
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau and the sale of such parkland for fair market value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.548 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.353 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5210 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1331 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05210 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - SIGNED CHAP.548