NY S00155 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the board of trustees of the state university to require applicants to state-operated institutions to state whether they have been convicted of a violent felony offense.
Title
Directs the board of trustees of the state university to require applicants to state-operated institutions to state whether they have been convicted of a violent felony offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.232 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.99 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |