NY S00155 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to persons designated as peace officers and the authority of such peace officers to carry, possess, repair, or dispose of a firearm without an appropriate license.
Title
Relates to persons designated as peace officers and the authority of such peace officers to carry, possess, repair, or dispose of a firearm without an appropriate license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-02-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 155A |
2019-02-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06675 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - enacting clause stricken
A08071 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
A08071 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes