NY S00161 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to veterans' preferences with respect to civil service promotions; removes requirement of service during a time of war for additional points on civil service examinations for veterans.
Title
Relates to veterans' preferences with respect to civil service promotions; removes requirement of service during a time of war for additional points on civil service examinations for veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2022-03-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-03-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.316 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-28 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2021-02-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.203 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05406 (Same As) 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary