NY S00166 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires transmitters of money to provide a warning which informs consumers of certain fraudulent activities that may occur.
Title
Requires transmitters of money to provide a warning which informs consumers of certain fraudulent activities that may occur.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2022-02-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.212 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-17 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 166B |
2021-03-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 166A |
2021-02-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.186 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A05864 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - REFERRED TO BANKS