NY S00177 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes housing authorities to operate bingo games; adds guests invited by residents of any apartment, condominium or cooperative complex, housing authority, retirement community, or other group residential complex or facility to the scope of application; allows games to be conducted two days per week; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes housing authorities to operate bingo games; adds guests invited by residents of any apartment, condominium or cooperative complex, housing authority, retirement community, or other group residential complex or facility to the scope of application; allows games to be conducted two days per week; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.375 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |