NY S00182 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of glyphosate and products containing glyphosate in any park, playground or picnic area owned or operated by New York state, New York city, or any municipality.
Title
Prohibits the use of glyphosate and products containing glyphosate in any park, playground or picnic area owned or operated by New York state, New York city, or any municipality.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] |
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 182A |
2019-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00732 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70