NY S00184 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION
Pending: Senate New York City Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION
Pending: Senate New York City Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Three King's day as a school holiday for all public schools in a city school district of a city having a population of one million or more inhabitants.
Title
Establishes Three King's day as a school holiday for all public schools in a city school district of a city having a population of one million or more inhabitants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO NEW YORK CITY EDUCATION |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02551 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education