NY S00199 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4010B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4010B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation to annually prepare and submit to the legislature certain highway pavement and bridge condition reports.
Title
Requires the department of transportation to annually prepare and submit to the legislature certain highway pavement and bridge condition reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4010B |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 199B |
2021-06-07 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.420 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 199A |
2021-01-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04010 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - approval memo.94