NY S00215 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of human rights to develop an anti-bias and inclusion training; requires certain public employees and private contractors to complete such training bi-annually.
Title
Requires the division of human rights to develop an anti-bias and inclusion training; requires certain public employees and private contractors to complete such training bi-annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1469 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 215B |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 215A |
2019-05-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A03162 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to labor