NY S00219 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A716
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits state lottery winners to remain anonymous to the general public.
Title
Permits state lottery winners to remain anonymous to the general public.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A716 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1810 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1361 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A00716 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - tabled