NY S00221 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 221A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to removing the lifetime ban on jury duty for convicted felons who have completed their sentencing, including any period of probation or community supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to removing the lifetime ban on jury duty for convicted felons who have completed their sentencing, including any period of probation or community supervision.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 221A
2019-02-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-01-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-01-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.57
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A04760 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - advanced to third reading cal.159

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback