NY S00231 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-07 - signed chap.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes in the city of Buffalo a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in school speed zones by means of photo devices.
Title
Establishes in the city of Buffalo a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in school speed zones by means of photo devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | Senate | signed chap.148 |
2019-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.47 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S231 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-19 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-03-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.39 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | rules report cal.39 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-12 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A951 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.47 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00951 (Same As) 2019-08-07 - signed chap.148