NY S00245 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 245A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - PRINT NUMBER 245A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Learning for Work act"; establishes the youth apprenticeship program and the enhanced regents professional diploma; appropriates moneys therefor.
Title
Enacts the "Learning for Work act"; establishes the youth apprenticeship program and the enhanced regents professional diploma; appropriates moneys therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 245A |
2018-01-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04333 (Same As) 2017-02-02 - referred to education
A09084 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - held for consideration in education
A09084 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - held for consideration in education