NY S00245 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care and requires the office to prepare an annual report detailing such.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care and requires the office to prepare an annual report detailing such.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-13 | Senate | vetoed memo.197 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1119 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S245A |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.374 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to children and families |
2019-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A580 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1119 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 245A |
2019-02-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00580 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - tabled