NY S00250 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a private student loan refinance task force to study and report on ways lending institutions offering private student loans to graduates of institutions of higher education can be encouraged to establish student loan refinancing programs.
Title
Establishes a private student loan refinance task force to study and report on ways lending institutions offering private student loans to graduates of institutions of higher education can be encouraged to establish student loan refinancing programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2020-02-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.128 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 250A |
2020-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.30 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06812 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken