NY S00255 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.163
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-31 - APPROVAL MEMO.163
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires prevailing wage to be paid for work performed on a public works project for any work involving the delivery to and hauling of aggregate supply construction materials, as well as any return hauls, whether empty or loaded and any time spent loading/unloading.
Title
Requires prevailing wage to be paid for work performed on a public works project for any work involving the delivery to and hauling of aggregate supply construction materials, as well as any return hauls, whether empty or loaded and any time spent loading/unloading.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.163 |
2021-12-31 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.823 |
2021-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.526 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a1106b |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 255B |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.592 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 255A |
2021-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01106 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s255b