NY S00260 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.470
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing Long Island residents water usage information with their bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing Long Island residents water usage information with their bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28AssemblySIGNED CHAP.470
2018-12-18SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.422
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10881a
2018-06-18Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2018-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1811
2018-06-18SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 260A
2018-05-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2017-01-04SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A10881 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s260a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback