NY S00273 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-13 - signed chap.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to child abuse in an educational setting; clarifies that it includes individuals employed by a school and individuals employed by a person or entity that contracts with a school to provide transportation services.
Title
Relates to child abuse in an educational setting; clarifies that it includes individuals employed by a school and individuals employed by a person or entity that contracts with a school to provide transportation services.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Children and Families Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-13 | Senate | signed chap.164 |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.238 |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S273A |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.120 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-20 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-03-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5842 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.238 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 273A |
2019-02-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05842 (Same As) 2019-08-13 - signed chap.164