NY S00301 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - signed chap.256
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - signed chap.256
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to including electronic cigarettes and liquid nicotine within the tobacco use and prevention program.
Title
Relates to including electronic cigarettes and liquid nicotine within the tobacco use and prevention program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.256 |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1486 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S301A |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.317 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.317 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-13 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | print number 481a |
2019-04-25 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A481A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1486 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 301A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00481 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - signed chap.256