NY S00335 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the protection of the air quality at licensed day care centers and head start day care centers funded pursuant to federal law; requires the office of children and family services to consult with the commissioners of environmental conservation and health regarding the air quality and environmental hazards that may be involved with any new day care center or head start day care center; requires such office to consult with the department of health if any new environmental or environmental health hazard arises.
Title
Provides for the protection of the air quality at licensed day care centers and head start day care centers funded pursuant to federal law; requires the office of children and family services to consult with the commissioners of environmental conservation and health regarding the air quality and environmental hazards that may be involved with any new day care center or head start day care center; requires such office to consult with the department of health if any new environmental or environmental health hazard arises.
Sponsors
Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00947 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - advanced to third reading cal.357