NY S00335 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates offenses against law enforcement officers, firefighters and emergency medical services personnel as hate crimes.
Title
Designates offenses against law enforcement officers, firefighters and emergency medical services personnel as hate crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-11 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05065 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes