NY S00338 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-23 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurers from limiting payment on claims for damage to motor vehicles based on pricing caps for labor, parts, paint or repair materials; prohibits insurers from recommending a particular repair facility; and requires insurers to provide and retain a signed notice to claimants in relation to insured's right to have a vehicle repaired in the shop of his/her choice.
Title
Prohibits insurers from limiting payment on claims for damage to motor vehicles based on pricing caps for labor, parts, paint or repair materials; prohibits insurers from recommending a particular repair facility; and requires insurers to provide and retain a signed notice to claimants in relation to insured's right to have a vehicle repaired in the shop of his/her choice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2014-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1689 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A00483 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to insurance